DB Insurance Co., Ltd. v. SAGA Welco AS

Plaintiff: DB Insurance Co., Ltd.
Defendant: SAGA Welco AS
Case Number: 4:2019cv01758
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1300
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SAGA Welco AS filed by DB Insurance Co., Ltd.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by DB Insurance Co., Ltd..(Oliver, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to SAGA Welco AS served on 5/15/2019, answer due 8/13/2019, filed.(Oliver, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SAGA Welco AS. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(sanderson, 4)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by DB Insurance Co., Ltd., filed.(Oliver, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to SAGA Welco AS, filed.(Oliver, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAGA Welco AS (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22417432) filed by DB Insurance Co., Ltd..(Oliver, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DB Insurance Co., Ltd. v. SAGA Welco AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DB Insurance Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Robert C. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAGA Welco AS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?