County of Walker v. OptumRx, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: County of Walker
Defendant: OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Specialty, L.P., Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Caremark RX LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Malinckrodt Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNiel-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Caremark PCS Health PLLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Pfizer Inc, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc., Paddock Laboratories, Inc., NexGen, The Purdue Frederick Company, Mylan Technologies Inc., Advanced Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Caremark PCS LLC, United HealthCare Services, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Nesher Pharmaceuticals (USA) LLC, Actavis LLC, J M Smith Corporation, Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Purue Pharma, L.P., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Noven Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Navitus Holdings, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, ICU Medical Sales, Inc., Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Mylan Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Neos Therapeutics Inc, Perrigo Company, PLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CuraScript Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Medco Health Solutions of Texas LLC, Zogenix, Inc., Caremark LLC, Insys Manufacturing LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., King Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mission Pharmacal Company, Prime Therapeutics LLC and Fresenius Kabi USA
Case Number: 4:2019cv01767
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 82 REPLY in Support of #54 MOTION to Stay Preceedings Pending Final Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Yetter, R)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order: Initial Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 9, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn N Hughes. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #71 MOTION for John Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 5, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition to #54 MOTION to Stay Preceedings Pending Final Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by County of Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, "Order Regarding Remands", #2 Proposed Order)(Correro, Mark)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time.The deadline for Zogenix to respond to the Complaint isextended to 30 days following entry of an order by either: (i) this Court ruling on Plaintiffsmotion to remand; or (2) the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 3, 2019 Filing 75 REPLY in Support of #40 MOTION to Remand, filed by County of Walker. (Correro, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Zogenix, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yue, Herman)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc..(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 2, 2019 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition to #40 MOTION to Remand, filed by CuraScript Inc, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barger, Heather)
July 2, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION for John Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Zogenix, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2019. (Yue, Herman)
July 2, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Zogenix, Inc., filed.(Yue, Herman)
July 2, 2019 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zogenix, Inc., filed.(Yue, Herman)
July 2, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Herman Yue on behalf of Zogenix, Inc., filed. (Yue, Herman)
July 2, 2019 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to the Complaint by Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rahmn, Michael)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Brian Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Caroline R. Strumph to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Kimberly K. Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for William H. Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Main Document 62 replaced on 6/21/2019) (sashabranner, 4). (Main Document 62 replaced on 6/21/2019) (sashabranner, 4).
June 19, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for William Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed. (Crain, Sean)
June 19, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Kimberly Chemerinsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed. (Crain, Sean)
June 19, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for Caroline Strumph to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed. (Crain, Sean)
June 19, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Brian D. Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed. (Crain, Sean)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Robert J. Gilbertson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 17, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Robert J. Gilbertson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prime Therapeutics LLC, filed. (Kelly, Kristen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Stay Preceedings Pending Final Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Memorandum ISO Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Order)(Yetter, R)
June 14, 2019 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by H.D. Smith, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haskins, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by H.D. Smith, LLC, filed.(Haskins, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Haskins, Jr. on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC, filed. (Haskins, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prime Therapeutics LLC, filed.(Landry, Andre)
June 13, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Gilbertson on behalf of Prime Therapeutics LLC, filed. (Landry, Andre)
June 13, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeleine E. Brunner on behalf of Neos Therapeutics Inc, filed. (Brunner, Madeleine)
June 13, 2019 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neos Therapeutics Inc, filed.(Jones, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Neos Therapeutics Inc, filed.(Jones, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Jones on behalf of Neos Therapeutics Inc, filed. (Jones, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #42 Motion to Expedite.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
June 12, 2019 Filing 43 Corrected MOTION to Remand by County of Walker, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Correro, Mark)
June 12, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Expedite Walker County's Motion to Remand by County of Walker, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Correro, Mark)
June 11, 2019 Filing 41 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Insys Manufacturing LLC, filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Remand by County of Walker, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Order)(Correro, Mark)
June 5, 2019 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fresenius Kabi USA, filed.(Hampton, Charles)
June 4, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ICU Medical Sales, Inc., filed.(Caire, Brandon)
June 3, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Noven Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Hisamitsu Pharmaceutical Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Peck, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Wahl on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Wahl, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, LLC identifying Pfizer Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Burbach, Edward)
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Paddock Laboratories, Inc., Perrigo Company, PLC, filed.(Melkonian, Raffi)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burbach, Edward)
May 31, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J M Smith Corporation, filed.(Babb, Kenneth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Actavis LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., filed.(Patterson, Nancy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., filed.(Smyser, Craig)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NexGen, filed.(Sullivan, Ryan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mission Pharmacal Company, filed.(Sullivan, Ryan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nesher Pharmaceuticals (USA) LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., filed.(Oakley, Bruce)
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health Corporation, filed.(Torian, Mark)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, filed.(Hudson, Timothy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prime Therapeutics LLC, filed.(Landry, Andre)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC identifying Mallinckrodt plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Mylan Technologies Inc., filed.(Boyce, Maria)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., filed.(Griffith, Douglas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNiel-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Griffin, Asher)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purue Pharma, L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., filed.(Reed, Noelle)
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Mengis, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Optum, Inc., OptumRX Holdings, LLC, OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., United HealthCare Services, Inc., filed.(Barger, Heather)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paddock Laboratories, Inc., Perrigo Company, PLC identifying Perrigo Company plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Melkonian, Raffi)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Respond to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ICU Medical Sales, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order proposed ORder)(Caire, Brandon)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; The Court ORDERS that the deadline for named Manufacturer Defendants Purdue Pharma, L.P.; Purdue Pharma, Inc.; The Purdue Frederick Company; Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.;n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Nesher Pharmaceuticals (USA) LLC and Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.; Advanced Pharma; Abbott Laboratories; Abbott Laboratories Inc.; Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., and Mylan Technologies Inc; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; WatsonLaboratories, Inc.; Mallinckrodt plc; Mallinckrodt LLC; Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals; and Mallinckrodt Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to thirty (30) days following the latest of: (1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL(Case No. 2804); (2) entry of an order with this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand; or (3) June 5, 2019.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer, move to dismiss, orotherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to and including thirty (30) days from the later of: (1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL (Case No. 2804); (2) entry of an order with this Courts ruling on Plaintiffs motion to remand; or (3) June 5, 2019 by defendants OptumRx, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, Optum, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions of Texas, LLC, Curascript, Inc., Navitus Holdings, LLC,(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Manufacturer Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Purue Pharma, L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNiel-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Nesher Pharmaceuticals (USA) LLC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Advanced Pharma, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty, L.P., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Technologies Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, Malinckrodt Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Paddock Laboratories, Inc., Perrigo Company, PLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Yetter, R)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., Paddock Laboratories, Inc., Perrigo Company, PLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yetter, R)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Raffi Melkonian on behalf of Perrigo Company, PLC, Paddock Laboratories, Inc., filed. (Melkonian, Raffi)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,,, #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, by Optum, Inc., OptumRX Holdings, LLC, OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed.(Barger, Heather)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., filed.(Barger, Heather)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22428450) filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - UHC of TX Service, #2 Exhibit A-2 - OptumRx, Inc Service, #3 Exhibit A-3 - OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC Service, #4 Exhibit A-4 - UHG Service, #5 Exhibit A-5 - Optum, Inc. Service, #6 Exhibit A-6 - ESHC Notice of Service, #7 Exhibit A-7 - ESI Notice of Service, #8 Exhibit B - Walker County - State Court Pleadings, #9 Exhibit C-1 - Walker County 19-29076 Docket Sheet, #10 Exhibit C-2 - Harris County Docket Sheet, #11 Exhibit D - Walker County Docket Sheet, #12 Exhibit E - Counsel List, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barger, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Walker v. OptumRx, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Represented By: William H Jordan
Represented By: Caroline R Strrumph
Represented By: Kimberly K Chemerinsky
Represented By: Sean Rajan Crain
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Represented By: William H Jordan
Represented By: Caroline R Strrumph
Represented By: Kimberly K Chemerinsky
Represented By: Sean Rajan Crain
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Represented By: William H Jordan
Represented By: Caroline R Strrumph
Represented By: Kimberly K Chemerinsky
Represented By: Sean Rajan Crain
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Represented By: William H Jordan
Represented By: Caroline R Strrumph
Represented By: Kimberly K Chemerinsky
Represented By: Sean Rajan Crain
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Represented By: William H Jordan
Represented By: Caroline R Strrumph
Represented By: Kimberly K Chemerinsky
Represented By: Sean Rajan Crain
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Alper T Ertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Specialty, L.P.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Timothy E Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX LLC
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malinckrodt Inc.
Represented By: James Clayborn Burnett
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNiel-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health PLLC
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aveva Drug Delivery Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Rahmn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paddock Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NexGen
Represented By: Ryan James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Cory S Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Thomas G Haskins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS LLC
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Coghlan Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nesher Pharmaceuticals (USA) LLC
Represented By: Bruce Davidson Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Smith Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth Patrick Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purue Pharma, L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noven Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey F Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy E Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: James Clayborn Burnett
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: James Clayborn Burnett
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICU Medical Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Egan Caire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Alper T Ertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neos Therapeutics Inc
Represented By: Madeleine Elise Brunner
Represented By: Christopher Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company, PLC
Represented By: Raffi Melkonian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Represented By: Brian D Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CuraScript Inc
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions of Texas LLC
Represented By: Douglas Stuart Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zogenix, Inc.
Represented By: Herman Heng Yue
Represented By: John Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark LLC
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: John William Ellis
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Davidson Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Edward Donald Burbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Pharmacal Company
Represented By: Ryan James Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Therapeutics LLC
Represented By: Robert J Gilbertson
Represented By: Kristen W Kelly
Represented By: Andre M Landry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kabi USA
Represented By: Amy B Manning
Represented By: Charles Bedford Hampton
Represented By: Kathryn Semmler Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Walker
Represented By: George Allan Van Fleet
Represented By: Mance Michael Park
Represented By: Mark Anthony Correro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?