AHG Properties, LLC et al v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company

Plaintiff: Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC and AHG Properties, LLC
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01780
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #12 Amended MOTION to Remand, filed by AHG Properties, LLC, Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC. (Saxe, Tracy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #12 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Christopher, Alissa)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Remand by AHG Properties, LLC, Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saxe, Tracy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Saxe, Tracy)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for K Alexandra Byrd to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for K. Alexandra Byrd to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AHG Properties, LLC, Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2019. (Saxe, Tracy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AHG Properties, LLC, Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC, filed.(Saxe, Tracy)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Alan Saxe on behalf of AHG Properties, LLC, Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC, filed. (Saxe, Tracy)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Michael R. Davisson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Michael R. Davisson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/13/2019. (Christopher, Alissa)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed.(Christopher, Alissa)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company identifying Starr International Company, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Christopher, Alissa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2019-29904 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22436553) filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Christopher, Alissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AHG Properties, LLC et al v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastwood Terrace and Oakhill Plaza, LLC
Represented By: Kristen Alexandra Byrd
Represented By: Tracy Alan Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHG Properties, LLC
Represented By: Kristen Alexandra Byrd
Represented By: Tracy Alan Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Alissa Kirksey Christopher
Represented By: Michael R. Davisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?