JJBR Investments LLC dba Airport Food Mart v. AmGuard Insurance Company

Plaintiff: JJBR Investments LLC dba Airport Food Mart and JJBR Investments LLC
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv01793
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: July/August 2020. ETT: 2 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2019 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 10/31/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 11/29/2019. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/28/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/28/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/11/2019. Scheduling order issued. Appearances: Daniel Glenn Durell, Rahul Narendranath Lamba.(ERO:L. Purifoy), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by AmGuard Insurance Company, filed.(Durell, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, 4)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECUSAL ORDER. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Rahul Narendranath Lamba to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JJBR Investments LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mmapps, 4)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AmGuard Insurance Company, filed.(Durell, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 201925546 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22443413) filed by AmGuard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - List of Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - State Court File)(Durell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JJBR Investments LLC dba Airport Food Mart v. AmGuard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJBR Investments LLC dba Airport Food Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JJBR Investments LLC
Represented By: Rahul Narendranath Lamba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmGuard Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel Glenn Durell
Represented By: Susan Allison Kidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?