Spurling v. Comminie

Plaintiff: Dennis Spurling
Defendant: Jamaal Comminie
Case Number: 4:2019cv01795
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Exhibit A by Dennis Spurling, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Axel, Jeremy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Dennis Spurling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Axel, Jeremy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Jamaal Comminie, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of J. Comminie, #2 Exhibit Drivers License, #3 Exhibit Order of Dismissal, #4 Proposed Order)(Meyerson, Jeff)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jamaal Comminie served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Transfer. Dennis Spurling's motion to transfer is denied #5 . terminate #6 .(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Axel on behalf of Dennis Spurling, filed. (Axel, Jeremy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to Hon Ewing Werlein, Jr. by Dennis Spurling, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spurling, Dennis)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Hon. Ewing Werlein, Jr. by Dennis Spurling, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spurling, Dennis)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jamaal Comminie. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jamaal Comminie, filed.(Spurling, Dennis)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jamaal Comminie (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22445723) filed by Dennis Spurling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Spurling, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurling v. Comminie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamaal Comminie
Represented By: Jeff Meyerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Spurling
Represented By: Dennis D Spurling
Represented By: Jeremy Axel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?