Alvarado v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raymond Alvarado
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01810
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. Case terminated on 6/28/19.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims Without Prejudice (Joint) by Raymond Alvarado, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trimble, Dale)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond ; Answer due for Abbott Laboratories, Inc. 7/2/2019(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waldo, Curtis)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Raymond Alvarado, filed.(Trimble, Dale)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for James David Bickham to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for J. David Bickham to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2019. (Waldo, Curtis)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Abbott Laboratories, Inc. 6/18/2019.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waldo, Curtis)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Waldo, Curtis)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Waldo, Curtis)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 284th District Court of Montgomery County, Texas, case number 19-04-05569 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22452924) filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet and List of Counsel of Record, #4 Appendix Index of Filings)(Waldo, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Waldo
Represented By: James David Bickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Waldo
Represented By: James David Bickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Alvarado
Represented By: Dale Lee Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?