John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Greer et al

Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Defendant: Marilyn J. Greer and Estate of William J. Greer
Case Number: 4:2019cv01834
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-1834 and Member Case No. 4:19-cv-2132 (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #6 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Declaratory Judgment in Greer v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Estate of William J. Greer served on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019, filed.(Assadi, Raha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Transfer. Case reassigned to Judge Sim Lake for the following reason: Agreement between the Judges. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (bthomas, 4)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Declaratory Judgment in Greer v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Assadi, Raha)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Raha Assadi on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.), filed. (Assadi, Raha)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Marilyn J. Greer served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard S. Roth on behalf of Marilyn J. Greer, filed. (Roth, Leonard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Resolution of Petition for Declaratory Judgment in Greer v. John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) by Marilyn J. Greer, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2019. (Roth, Leonard)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Marilyn J. Greer. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(pyebernetsky, 4)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Marilyn J. Greer, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) identifying Manulife Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.), filed.(Jubinsky, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22468150) filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jubinsky, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Greer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn J. Greer
Represented By: Leonard S Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of William J. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Raha Assadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?