Pendergraft et al

In Re: Network of Neighbors
Appellant: Scott Richard Pendergraft and Danielle Pauline Pendergraft
Case Number: 4:2019cv01838
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Appeal Review Notes re: #5 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid. The appeal filing fee has not been paid. No hearings were held in the case - no transcripts. Number of DKT-13 Forms expected: 1, filed. (rnieto, 1)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #5 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Not Paid, filed. (Attachments: #1 NOA) (rnieto, 1)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Danielle Pauline Pendergraft, Scott Richard Pendergraft, filed.(jdav, 4)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The case has been resolved; there are no outstanding issues; more than two years have passed since the entry of the Order.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bruster "Bruse" Loyd on behalf of Network of Neighbors, filed. (Loyd, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Danielle Pauline Pendergraft, Scott Richard Pendergraft, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2019. Originally docketed in Adversary case 12-3445 on 5/16/2019. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal from an Order or Judgment of the Bankruptcy Court. On 5/16/2019, Danielle-Pauline Pendergraft and Scott Richard Pendergraft filed a notice of appeal. The appeal has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Kenneth Hoyt, Civil Action 19-1838. Parties notified, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendergraft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Network of Neighbors
Represented By: Michael P Ridulfo
Represented By: John Bruster Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Scott Richard Pendergraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Danielle Pauline Pendergraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?