Phillips v. Sadler et al

Plaintiff: Reginald Phillips
Defendant: Bryan Sadler and Sadler Express Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01857
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bryan Sadler, Sadler Express Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lapidus, Mark)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bryan Sadler, Sadler Express Inc., filed.(Lapidus, Mark)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial District Court, case number 2019-24639 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22477386) filed by Sadler Express Inc., Bryan Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Lapidus, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Sadler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Sadler
Represented By: Mark R Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sadler Express Inc.
Represented By: Mark R Lapidus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Phillips
Represented By: Wanda Clive Markland
Represented By: Anjali Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?