Moore v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Charlene Rae Moore
Defendant: Progressive Property Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv01862
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed.(Faucheux, Carley)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas D. D'Arche, Bradley K. Jones, and Ryan A. Walton on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed. (Jones, Bradley)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed.(Faucheux, Carley)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to American Strategic Insurance Corporation served on 5/24/2019, answer due 7/23/2019, filed.(Patton, Justin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American Strategic Insurance Corporation filed by Charlene Rae Moore.(Patton, Justin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Charlene Rae Moore, filed.(Patton, Justin)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corporation identifying ARX Holding Corporation, The Progressive Corporation,ARX Executive Holdings, LLLP as Corporate Parent, filed.(Faucheux, Carley)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, filed.(Faucheux, Carley)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Case - Progressive)(Patton, Justin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22480371) filed by Charlene Rae Moore.(Patton, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Bradley K Jones
Represented By: Carley Ann Faucheux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Rae Moore
Represented By: Justin Daniel Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?