Brittain v. LeBlanc

Plaintiff: Brent Brittain
Defendant: Jerral LeBlanc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01865
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - the proceedings against Jerral Le Blanc are STAYED pending the resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings. Within twenty days of the close of the bankruptcy action, defendants shall notify the Court that the bankruptcy proceedings are complete. This cause of action is administratively (statistically) closed pending bankruptcy. Case terminated on 6/28/2019 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Jerral LeBlanc, filed. (Brown, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Statement of Removal Facts by Jerral LeBlanc, filed. (Brown, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Pratka on behalf of Jerral LeBlanc, filed. (Pratka, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 295th Judicial District of Harris County, case number 2019-23732 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22485747) filed by Jerral LeBlanc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Brown, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittain v. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerral LeBlanc
Represented By: Robert D Brown
Represented By: Andrew James Pratka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Brittain
Represented By: Joshua Paul Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?