Smith v. MTGLQ Investors, LP

Plaintiff: Wayne Smith
Defendant: MTGLQ Investors, LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv01888
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wayne Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019. (jdav, 4)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE Amended Certificate of Service re: #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, by MTGLQ Investors, LP, filed. (Hakari, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence by Wayne Smith, filed.(ckrus, 4)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatories Requested, filed by MTGLQ Investors, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of RBH, #2 Proposed Order prop Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)(Hakari, Robert)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Dismiss. Further that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that is compliant with the FRCP within 21 days from the date of this Order. Failure to file an amended complaint within 21 days will result in dismissal of Plaintiff's case without further notice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE Defendant's Advisory & Compliance with Court's Order for Scheduling Recommendations by MTGLQ Investors, LP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Rule 16 Scheduling Order)(Hakari, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Amended Certificate of Service of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by MTGLQ Investors, LP, filed.(Hakari, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by MTGLQ Investors, LP, filed.(Hakari, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray re #9 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatories Requested, filed. (ealexander, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Interrogatories Requested by Wayne Smith, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2019. (olindor, 4)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Wayne Smith re: Clarification, filed. (kpicota, 4)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by MTGLQ Investors, LP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hakari, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Production of Documents and Interrogatories by Wayne Smith, filed.(kpicota, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Wayne Smith re: Status of Case, filed. (kpicota, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Wayne Smith re: Financial Interest, filed. (kpicota, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Smith, filed.(kpicota, 4)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
May 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to MTGLQ Investors, LP. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(gclair, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU088838, filed. (gclair, 4)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MTGLQ Investors, LP filed by Wayne Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(gclair, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. MTGLQ Investors, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTGLQ Investors, LP
Represented By: Robert Brandon Hakari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?