Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Chovanec et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: Steven C. Chovanec and Cynthia L. Chovanec
Case Number: 4:2019cv01911
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time file answer to Complaint by Steven C. Chovanec, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nachtigall, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Steven C. Chovanec served on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019, filed.(Brinkley, Adam)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cynthia L. Chovanec served on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019, filed.(Brinkley, Adam)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, filed.(Brinkley, Adam)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cynthia L. Chovanec, Steven C. Chovanec. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 09:15 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Steven C. Chovanec, filed.(Brinkley, Adam)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Cynthia L. Chovanec, filed.(Brinkley, Adam)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America identifying Travelers Casualty and Surety Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Brinkley, Adam)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22504778) filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brinkley, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Chovanec et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Adam Adam Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Chovanec
Represented By: David Allen Nachtigall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L. Chovanec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?