Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc. et al v. Mack Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by an organization that advocates for the separation of church and states against a Texas justice of the peace who invites chaplains to hold prayer service in the courtroom before calling the cases to be heard for the day.

Plaintiff: Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc. and John Roe
Defendant: Wayne Mack - Official Judicial Capacity on behalf of State of Texas, Hon. Wayne Mack - Individual Capacity and Wayne Mack
Case Number: 4:2019cv01934
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Wayne Mack(Individual Capacity) served on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019, filed.(Grover, Samuel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Wayne Mack(Individual Capacity). Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Wayne Mack(Official Judicial Capacity on behalf of State of Texas ), filed.(Grover, Samuel)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 08:45 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Grover, Samuel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Protective Order by Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Memo Supporting Protective Order, #3 Exhibit Declaration of John Roe, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Sam Grover)(Grover, Samuel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22514175) filed by Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Grover, Samuel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22514175) filed by Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Grover, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc. et al v. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom From Religion Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Troxell Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Roe
Represented By: Samuel Troxell Grover,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Mack - Official Judicial Capacity on behalf of State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Wayne Mack - Individual Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?