Davis v. Mindshare Ventures LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Davis
Defendant: Mindshare Ventures LLC and Trendmaker Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01961
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Trendmaker Homes, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huber, Joshua)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Ana Tagvoryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Justin Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants to file an answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint is extended to July 24, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mindshare Ventures LLC, Trendmaker Homes, Inc. identifying TRI Pointe Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Huber, Joshua)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Ana Tagvoryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mindshare Ventures LLC, Trendmaker Homes, Inc., filed. (Huber, Joshua)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Justin Brandt to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mindshare Ventures LLC, Trendmaker Homes, Inc., filed. (Huber, Joshua)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Answer by Mindshare Ventures LLC, Trendmaker Homes, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Huber, Joshua)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lauren Davis, filed.(Radbil, Aaron)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Mindshare Ventures LLC served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019, filed.(Radbil, Aaron)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Trendmaker Homes, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019, filed.(Radbil, Aaron)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mindshare Ventures LLC, Trendmaker Homes, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Mindshare Ventures LLC Summons)(Radbil, Aaron)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mindshare Ventures LLC, Trendmaker Homes, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22525862) filed by Lauren Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screenshot, #2 Exhibit B - Trendmaker Website, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radbil, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Mindshare Ventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindshare Ventures LLC
Represented By: Justin Brandt
Represented By: Ana Tagvoryan
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trendmaker Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Brandt
Represented By: Ana Tagvoryan
Represented By: Joshua Andrew Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Davis
Represented By: Aaron David Radbil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?