Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V. v. Marfield Limited Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V.
Defendant: Marfield Limited Incorporated and Shanara Maritime International, S.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01963
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V., filed.(Huffman, Jay)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Marfield Limited Incorporated, Shanara Maritime International, S.A., filed.(Booth, Robert)
June 25, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Marfield Limited Incorporated, Shanara Maritime International, S.A., filed.(Booth, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 (USM-285) RETURN of Service Executed as to Gulf Copper Dry docket & Repair, Custodian of M/V Caballo Maya and M/V Caballo Marango on 6/4/19 re: Complaint, Writ of Attachment and Order, filed.(sanderson, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 (USM-285) RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Caballo Marango c/o Gulf Copper Dry Dock & Repair on 6/4/19 re: Complaint, Writ of Attachment, Order, filed.(sanderson, 4)
June 10, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of Service of Complaint, Writ of Attachment, Orders Executed as to Shanara Maritime International, S.A. served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019, filed.(lcorbett, 7)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of Service of Complaint, Writ of Attachemnt, Orders Executed as to Marfield Limited Incorporated served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019, filed.(lcorbett, 7)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. On May 31, 2019, an Order was entered "Directing Writ of Attachment" of the vessels M/V CABALLO MAYA and M/V CABALLO MARANGO (Document No. 7). That Order directed the Clerk to "issue a Writ of Attachment... directing the... U.S. Marshal... to serve the Writ... and attach the vessels." The Order further provided that the "attached property is to be kept safe andpreserved subject to further orders of [the] Court." While the Order did not designate a custodian of the vessels during the period of attachment, the directive that the attached property is to be kept safe and preserved" requires the appointment of a custodian. As such, the U.S. Marshal is designated as the custodian of the vessels during the period of attachment, with Plaintiff to bear all costs of that designation, including, if, required by the U.S. Marshal, any pre-payment of any expected custodian fees and expenses. Plaintiff may, of course, seek, by motion, a substitute custodian. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5) Modified on 6/7/2019 (ehernandez, 5).
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Caballo Maya c/o gulf Copper Dry Dock & Repair on 6/4/19 re: Form USM-285, filed.(nortiz, 5)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Caballo Marango c/o Gulf Copper Dry Dock & Repair on 6/4/19 re: Form USM-285, filed.(nortiz, 5)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service Executed as to Gulf Copper Dry Dock & Repair on 6/4/2019 re: Complaint, Writ of Garnishment, Order, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to Court by Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V., filed. (Herschaft, Jeremy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re Deposit of Attachment Bond into the Registry of the Court re: #10 Notice (Other) by Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V., filed. (Herschaft, Jeremy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE Re: Deposit of Attachment Bond Into the Registry of the Court re: #7 Order on Motion for Writ by Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V., filed. RECEIPT NO. HOU088996 (jguajardo, 4)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay T. Huffman on behalf of Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V., filed. (Huffman, Jay)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Issuance of Writ of Attachment re: #2 Motion for Writ.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Writ Attachment, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Writ of Attachment)(Huffman, Jay)
May 31, 2019 *** TELEPHONE conference held 5/31/19 2:13- 2:!5 with Atty Jeremy Herschaft, filed. (bwhite, 4)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Hearing by Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herschaft, Jeremy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER Directing Issuance of Writ of Attachment re: #1 Complaint,, filed.(Herschaft, Jeremy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ Attachment by Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Herschaft, Jeremy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marfield Limited Incorporated, Shanara Maritime International, S.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22525975) filed by Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2, #3 Exhibit A part 3, #4 Exhibit B part 1, #5 Exhibit B part 2, #6 Exhibit B part 3, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herschaft, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V. v. Marfield Limited Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marfield Limited Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Edward Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanara Maritime International, S.A.
Represented By: Robert Edward Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corporativo Grupo R SA DE C.V.
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Herschaft
Represented By: Jay Todd Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?