Dewees v. Office of Personnel Management
Plaintiff: Teresa G Dewees
Defendant: Office of Personnel Management
Case Number: 4:2019cv02001
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Extension of Time and for Appointment of Counsel. The Plaintiff must complete the Order for Conference with Defendant before the hearing on November 1, 2019. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time 90 day extension by Teresa G Dewees, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (dbenavides, 1)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and for Costs. The Court does not have funds to provide representation and costs to civil litigats. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, for Costs and for Service of Process. ( Motion Docket Date 6/25/2019.) by Teresa G Dewees, filed. (gclair, 4)
June 4, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU089041, filed. (gclair, 4)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Office of Personnel Management filed by Teresa G Dewees.(gclair, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dewees v. Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa G Dewees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Personnel Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?