Ardoin v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Adolphus Ardoin
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv02022
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service as to Ryan K Patrick, US Atty, filed.(agould, 3)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ryan K Patrick, U.S. Attorney served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019, filed.(agould, 3)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, filed.(sanderson, 4) ***USM-285 prepared and delivered to USM with Summons, Order granting IFP and copy of Complaint
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nancy Berryhill, Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, REgion VI; The United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas;The Attorney General of the United States, filed.(Dewberry, Donald)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill filed by Adolphus Ardoin. (Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 6/4/2019 by Judge Lynn Hughes)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ardoin v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adolphus Ardoin
Represented By: Donald Clifton Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?