Massey v. USA

Plaintiff: Wendy Massey
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2019cv02030
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed.(gkelner, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to USA served on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States. parties notified via NEF., filed.(jdav, 4)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to USA, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22560321) filed by Wendy Massey.(Paranjpe, Tej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Massey
Represented By: Tej R Paranjpe
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Ruemke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?