PHB WESERHUTTE S.A. v. Voestalpine Texas LLC et al
Respondent: BILFINGER WESTCON, INC., Voestalpine Texas LLC and Performance Energy Services, L.L.C.
Counter Defendant: PHB WESERHUTTE S.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02070
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 COUNTERCLAIM against PHB WESERHUTTE S.A. filed by Performance Energy Services, L.L.C..(Rosendahl, Patricia)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re: #7 Document by Performance Energy Services, L.L.C., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rosendahl, Patricia)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Answer and Response to PHB Weserhtte S.A.s Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award by Performance Energy Services, L.L.C., filed.(Rosendahl, Patricia)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Harrison, Lauren)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Rosendahl, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed.(Peden, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by PHB WESERHUTTE S.A., filed.(O'Rourke, Stephanie)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 02:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 PHB Weserhutte S.A.'s Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award/Other Miscellaneous Relief ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0541-22568503.) filed by PHB WESERHUTTE S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Rourke, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHB WESERHUTTE S.A. v. Voestalpine Texas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PHB WESERHUTTE S.A.
Represented By: Stephanie Lyn O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BILFINGER WESTCON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Voestalpine Texas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Performance Energy Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Patricia McGarvey Rosendahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?