Mosier v. Ogg et al
Plaintiff: Johnathan Mosier
Defendant: Kelli Johnson, Lina Hidalgo, Ed Gonzales and Kim Ogg
Case Number: 4:2019cv02081
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Prisoner Trust Fund ; Trust fund Report due 7/31/19 ( Notice of Compliance due by 7/31/2019)(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Johnathan Mosier, filed. (SarahShelby, 4)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Johnathan Mosier, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2019. (SarahShelby, 4)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to turn in his Application To Proceed with out prepaying fees by Johnathan Mosier, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2019. (nortiz, 5)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Obtain Prisoner Trust Fund by Johnathan Mosier, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (dnoriega, 1)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF by Johnathan Mosier, filed.(amireles, 2)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty days from date of this order, plaintiff must pay the $400.00 filing fee or submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis with a certified copy of his current inmate trust report. Plaintiffs failure to comply timely and fully with this order will result in dismissal of this lawsuit..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Johnathan Mosier, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2019. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Johnathan Mosier. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Envelope)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosier v. Ogg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelli Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lina Hidalgo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Ogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?