Barber v. Davis
Petitioner: Jesse L. Barber
Respondent: Byran Collier and Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2019cv02084
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Division (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 3, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, San Antonio Divison. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 7/5/2019, filed. (jdav, 4)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re: #7 Amended Complaint by Jesse L. Barber, filed.(dbenavides, 1)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lorie Davis filed by Jesse L. Barber. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jesse L. Barber.(SamanthaWarda, 4)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ( Correct Deficient Pleadings due by 7/17/2019.)(Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jesse L. Barber, filed. (sgonzalez, 5)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jesse L. Barber, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2019. (sgonzalez, 5)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Byran Collier (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Jesse L. Barber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope)(sgonzalez, 5)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse L. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Byran Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?