Fire and Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio v. CVS Health Corporation
Plaintiff: Fire and Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Walgreen Co, Qualitest Pharmaceuticals Inc, Mallinckrodt LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Richard D. Sackler, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc, Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon, Inc., McKesson Corporation Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries LTD, Amrisourcebergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Frederak Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, LP, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Manufacturing LLC, Noramco, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, LP, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02089
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 7/26/2019 re: 22 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Remand; denying as moot #15 Motion to Lift Stay; denying as moot #17 Motion to Lift Stay.This case is remanded to the 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Defendant CVS is ordered to transmit a copy of this Order to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and inform the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the case has been remanded..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreen Co, filed.(Simon, Joel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., filed.(Simon, Joel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Torian, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance, lnc., Walgreen Co., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, lnc., and CVS TN Distribution LLC. to answer or move to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to ( 1) five days after this case is remanded to Judge Robert Schaffer, or (2) fourteen days after this case is transferred to; In re Nat'l Prescription Opiate Litig., MDL No. 2804..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Opposed MOTION to Lift Stay by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Walgreen Co, Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Joel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, LLC, Walgreen Co, Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Joel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #11 MOTION to Remand by Fire and Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio, filed.(Sanford, Shelly)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Fire and Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sanford, Shelly)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC identifying Mallinckrodt plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Hill, Jack)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Smyser, Craig)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health Corporation, filed.(Torian, Mark)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., and CVS TN Distribution LLC to answer or move to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to July 5, 2019 or 20 days after the case is remanded to Judge Robert Schaffer, In re: Texas Opioid Litigation, Master File No. 2018-63587, in the 152nd Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, if remanded prior to July 5, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition by CVS Health Corporation, Walgreen Co, Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Joel)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER STAYING CASE re: #3 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. This case is STAYED. All pending motions are MOOT, but may be summarily re-urged if the automatic stay is lifted. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 201933724 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22577408) filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torian, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fire and Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio v. CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitest Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Claude F Reynaud, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: James Clayborn Burnett
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Elizabeth Adler
Represented By: Michelle Shamblin Stratton
Represented By: David Isaak
Represented By: Tyler G Doyle
Represented By: Crystal Noel Robles
Represented By: Razvan Ungureanu
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries LTD
Represented By: Brian M Ercole
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Represented By: Steven A Reed
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrisourcebergen Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Represented By: Michael Halley Bernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederak Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, LP
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A Durfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, LP
Represented By: Steven F. Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fire and Police Retiree Health Care Fund, San Antonio
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Represented By: Shelly A. Sanford
Represented By: Mikal C Watts
Represented By: Tommy Fibich
Represented By: Pamela R McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?