Pickaree v. Visa USA, Inc
Plaintiff: Marilyn R Pickaree
Defendant: Visa USA, Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv02130
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBITS B re: #7 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Visa USA, Inc, filed. (Doyle, Tyler)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Motion Docket Date 8/30/2019.), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Visa USA, Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Doyle, Tyler)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Marilyn R. Pickaree re: schedule of unavailability, filed. (sguevara, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE/ Notification of Submission to #3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols, filed by Marilyn R Pickaree. (BrendaLacy, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint by Marilyn R Pickaree, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
June 13, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU089235, filed. (mmapps, 4)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Visa USA, Inc filed by Marilyn R Pickaree. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mmapps, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickaree v. Visa USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa USA, Inc
Represented By: Tyler G Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn R Pickaree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?