ALVARADO et al v. CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P. et al

Plaintiff: TAMMY HAGA, CLARA REDMOND, TAMMY ALVARADO and AMY RUMINSKI
Defendant: LEE & MURPHY LAW FIRM, G.P., SCOTT A. LOVE, CLAYTON A. CLARK, HUTSON LAW FIRM, P.C., ERIN MURPHY, SCOTT A. LOVE, PC, LEE MURPHY LAW FIRM, JAMES LEE, JR., SHELLEY HUTSON, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P., CLAYTON A. CLARK, ESQ., PC and JAMES LEE LAW FIRM, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02148
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Setting as to #11 MOTION to Unseal Original Complaint. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9C before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Unseal Original Complaint filed by CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jefferson, Dale)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER re: #11 MOTION to Unseal Original Complaint, filed.(Beggs, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Unseal Original Complaint by TAMMY ALVARADO, TAMMY HAGA, CLARA REDMOND, AMY RUMINSKI, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exb 2. Email Ms. Hawkins (exb. 1 - original complaint is sealed.))(Beggs, James)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #9 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (hcarr, 4)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT re: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/19 before Judge Andrew S Hanen. Court Reporter Heather Alcaraz. Ordering Party Dale Jefferson. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019, filed. (halcaraz, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Dale Jefferson for Transcript of Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2019 on Emergency Motion to Seal Complaint before Judge Andrew S. Hanen.. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Heather Alcaraz, filed. (Jefferson, Dale)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Sealed Emergency Motion to Seal Complaint. The Court grants Plaintiffs' counsel to file a motion to unseal the Complaint no later than July 31, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Andrew S Hanen. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/1/2019. The Court heard argument of counsel on #5 Sealed Emergency Motion to Seal Complaint. The Court orders #1 Complaint sealed. Plaintiffs may file a motion to unseal by 7/31/2019. Appearances: James Miller Beggs, Lynda Joy Landers, Dale Jefferson, Billy Shepherd, (Court Reporter: H. Alcaraz), filed.(rhawkins)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Setting re: #5 SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 12:30 PM before Judge Andrew S Hanen, filed. (rhawkins)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION TO SEAL COMPLAINT by CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jefferson, Dale)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CLAYTON A. CLARK, CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P., CLAYTON A. CLARK, ESQ., PC, SHELLEY HUTSON, HUTSON LAW FIRM, P.C., JAMES LEE LAW FIRM, P.C., LEE & MURPHY LAW FIRM, G.P., JAMES LEE, JR., SCOTT A. LOVE, ERIN MURPHY, SCOTT A. LOVE, PC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Beggs, James)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22612667) filed by TAMMY HAGA, CLARA REDMOND, TAMMY ALVARADO, AMY RUMINSKI.(Beggs, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALVARADO et al v. CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE & MURPHY LAW FIRM, G.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT A. LOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON A. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUTSON LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT A. LOVE, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE MURPHY LAW FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LEE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELLEY HUTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK, LOVE & HUTSON, G.P.
Represented By: Dale Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON A. CLARK, ESQ., PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES LEE LAW FIRM, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY HAGA
Represented By: James Miller Beggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARA REDMOND
Represented By: James Miller Beggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY ALVARADO
Represented By: James Miller Beggs
Represented By: Lynda Joy Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY RUMINSKI
Represented By: James Miller Beggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?