Solano v. Schroder et al
Plaintiff: Edgar Solano
Defendant: Timothy D. Schroder and Schroder's Towing & Auto Salvage, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02160
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Final DISMISSAL. Having been advised that the parties agree to dismiss this case, it is dismissed without prejudice #7 . If refiled in this district, it will be reassigned to Judge Lynn N. Hughes. Case terminated on 7/11/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Cornelius J. Calnan to Appear as Attorney by Edgar Solano, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2019. (Lopez, Jose)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Edgar Solano, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order on Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice, #2 Stipulation)(Lopez, Jose)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY re: #5 Initial Disclosures by Timothy D. Schroder, Schroder's Towing & Auto Salvage, LLC, filed. (Williams, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Timothy D. Schroder, Schroder's Towing & Auto Salvage, LLC, filed.(Williams, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Timothy D. Schroder, Schroder's Towing & Auto Salvage, LLC, filed.(Williams, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Civil Court at Law No. 1, Harris County, Texas, case number 1132927 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22618055) filed by Schroder's Towing & Auto Salvage, LLC, Timothy D. Schroder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Williams, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solano v. Schroder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Solano
Represented By: Jose R Lopez, II
Represented By: Cornelius Joseph Calnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Schroder
Represented By: Michael D Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schroder's Towing & Auto Salvage, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?