Cox et al v. Francesca's Holdings Corp. et al
Plaintiff: D'Shaunta Perry and Leah Cox
Defendant: Francesca's Holdings Corp. and Francesca's Collections, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02167
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Tamra C. Givens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Tamra C. Givens to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah Cox, D'Shaunta Perry, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Quiles, Alan)
July 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Paolo Chagas Meireles to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Paolo Chagas Meireles to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah Cox, D'Shaunta Perry, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/22/2019. (Meireles, Paolo)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Leah Cox, filed.(Quiles, Alan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Gregg Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Logan Pardell to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Logan A. Pardell to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah Cox, D'Shaunta Perry, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2019. (Pardell, Logan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Gregg I. Shavitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah Cox, D'Shaunta Perry, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/19/2019. (Shavitz, Gregg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Consents to Join by Leah Cox, D'Shaunta Perry, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quiles, Alan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Francesca's Collections, Inc., Francesca's Holdings Corp., filed.(Quiles, Alan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Francesca's Collections, Inc., Francesca's Holdings Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22619094) filed by Leah Cox, D'Shaunta Perry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quiles, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Francesca's Holdings Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Shaunta Perry
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles
Represented By: Paolo Chagas Meireles
Represented By: Tamra C Givens
Represented By: Logan A Pardell
Represented By: Gregg I Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Cox
Represented By: Alan Luis Quiles
Represented By: Paolo Chagas Meireles
Represented By: Tamra C Givens
Represented By: Logan A Pardell
Represented By: Gregg I Shavitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesca's Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesca's Collections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?