Ellis County v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ellis County
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., CVS Health, McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Cardinal Health, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02256
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Lift Stay, Or in The Alternative, Motion for Reconsideration of Stay Orders re: #32 MOTION to Lift Stay by Ellis County, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McCarley, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Lift Stay by Ellis County, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Remand, filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Simon, Joel)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL #12 MOTION to Remand. Case terminated on July 24, 2019 (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 23, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Simon, Joel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Joel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed.(Simon, Joel)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Correct.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Correct #7 Order by Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., SpecGX LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc., filed.(Durfee, Laura)
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health, filed.(Torian, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., filed.(Reed, Noelle)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., filed.(Patterson, Nancy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allergan Finance, LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC identifying Mallinckrodt plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed.(Smyser, Craig)
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, filed.(Mengis, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Ann Saucer on behalf of Ellis County, filed. (Saucer, S)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Remand re: #12 MOTION to Remand by Ellis County, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Arlington County v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.)(McCarley, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Ellis County, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarley, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Endo International plc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Reassignment. Parties notified, filed. (aboyd, 4)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sim Lake recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner for all further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Petition by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Noelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition by CVS Health, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 RESPONSE to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Ellis County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McCarley, Matthew)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ellis County, case number 100921 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22662896) filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Simon, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis County v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Represented By: Stephen Michael Fernelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Laura Jane Durfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis County
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Matthew S Daniel
Represented By: Bryan Fears
Represented By: Nabil Majed Nachawati, II
Represented By: S Ann Saucer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?