Redfern et al v. SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Richardson, Dustin Smith, Daniel Barreras, Justin Redfern, Odilio Cabrera, Luke Moskal, David Davenport, Heather Reinhardt, Ryan Wiles, Shane Jackson, Cory Rosser, Randy Shane Jackson, Scott McGlumphy and John Copeland
Defendant: SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02310
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sandbox Transportation, LLC filed by Heather Reinhardt.(Alexander, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sandbox Transportation, LLC filed by Justin Redfern, Scott McGlumphy, David Davenport, John Copeland, Cory Rosser.(Alexander, William)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sandbox Transportation, LLC filed by Justin Redfern, Luke Moskal, Eric Richardson, Dustin Smith, Odilio Cabrera, Shane Jackson, Ryan Wiles.(Alexander, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sandbox Transportation, LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019, filed.(Alexander, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Justin Redfern, filed.(Braddy, Lauren)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sandbox Transportation, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC, filed.(Alexander, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22691929) filed by Daniel Barreras, Justin Redfern, Luke Moskal, Eric Richardson, Dustin Smith, Odilio Cabrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redfern et al v. SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Richardson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Smith
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Barreras
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Redfern
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odilio Cabrera
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Moskal
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Davenport
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Reinhardt
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Wiles
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Jackson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Rosser
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Shane Jackson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott McGlumphy
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Copeland
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDBOX TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?