Grey Rock Gathering & Marketing, L.L.C. v. Devall Commercial Barge Line, LLC.
Defendant: Devall Commercial Barge Line, L.L.C. and Grey Rock Gathering & Marketing, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02320
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Grey Rock Gathering & Marketing, L.L.C., filed.(Crew, Paxton)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Devall Commercial Barge Line, L.L.C., filed.(Oppermann, Gus)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Devall Commercial Barge Line, L.L.C., filed.(Oppermann, Gus)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Devall Commercial Barge Line, L.L.C. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Crew, Paxton)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 03:15 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Devall Commercial Barge Line, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22695304) filed by Grey Rock Gathering & Marketing, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crew, Paxton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grey Rock Gathering & Marketing, L.L.C. v. Devall Commercial Barge Line, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devall Commercial Barge Line, L.L.C.
Represented By: Gus David Oppermann, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grey Rock Gathering & Marketing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Paxton N Crew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?