Suniverse, LLC v. Encore Credit Corp et al
Plaintiff: Suniverse, LLC
Defendant: LaSalle Bank, National Association, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Encore Credit Corp
Case Number: 4:2019cv02331
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Lis Pendens by Suniverse, LLC, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Suniverse, LLC, filed.(Jackson, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee, filed.(Danner, R)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Jackson on behalf of Suniverse, LLC, filed. (Jackson, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.; U.S. Bancorp; Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. and MERSCORP Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Troiano, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 400th Judicial District Court, Ft. Bend County, Texas, case number 19-DCV-262893 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22698137) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Suniverse, #2 Exhibit B - Encore, #3 Exhibit C - State Court File, #4 Exhibit D - CAD, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Coversheet)(Danner, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suniverse, LLC v. Encore Credit Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suniverse, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel P Troiano
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Credit Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?