Williams et al v. Avon Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Williams and Marvin Williams
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Revlon Consumer Products Corporation, Randall's Food & Drug LP, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Avon Products, Inc., Randall's Food Markets, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. and Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02337
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Cori Cudabac Steinmann as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. re: #16 Notice Regarding Initial Conference, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachael S. Fountain on behalf of Avon Products, Inc., filed. (Fountain, Rachael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Remand, filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corporation. (Solomon, Kimberly)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Marvin Williams, Shirley Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDowell, Darren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Cori Cudabac Steinmann as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (gkelner, 4)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(2) by Cyprus Mines Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(2) by Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Marvin Williams, Shirley Williams, filed.(McDowell, Darren)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Cori Cudabac Steinmann as to Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (agould, 3)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Revlon Consumer Products Corporation, filed.(Solomon, Kimberly)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, filed.(Solomon, Kimberly)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., filed.(Ogden, Todd)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., filed.(Formoso, Heleina)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Randall's Food & Drug LP, Randall's Food Markets, Inc., filed.(Borofsky, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Avon Products, Inc., filed.(Wolf, Tracy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Colgate-Palmolive Company, filed.(Jones, Quincy)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-35604 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22700103) filed by Revlon Consumer Products Corporation, Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1-B5, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Solomon, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Avon Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Kimberly Erin Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revlon Consumer Products Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Erin Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall's Food & Drug LP
Represented By: Michael Hines Borofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Todd D Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Heleina Lorraine Bautis Formoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Quincy Ann Marie Jones
Represented By: Jason Irvin
Represented By: Edward Morris Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Graves Wolf
Represented By: Brent Douglas Sedge
Represented By: Rachael Shantelle Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall's Food Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Hines Borofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Cori Cudabac Steinmann
Represented By: Heleina Lorraine Bautis Formoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yves Saint Laurent America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Williams
Represented By: Darren Patrick McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Williams
Represented By: Darren Patrick McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?