Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC v. Sun Trust Bank et al
Plaintiff: Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC
Defendant: Superior Refining Company, LLC, Digital Federal Credit Union and Sun Trust Bank
Case Number: 4:2019cv02442
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 ***Delivery Confirmation for delivery date(s) 8/14/19 re: 26 Document(s) Sent, filed. (dhansen, 4)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER OF REMAND GRANTING #13 MOTION to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the 234th District Court of Harris County, Texas. Case terminated on 8/8/2019.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 5, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Scaringe re: #23 Order, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A - Scaringe Declaration)(Flack, Paul)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to submit a declaration within ten (10) days of this order clearly identifying all of the members of Evergreen North America Acquisitions LLC. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
July 31, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand, filed by Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supp Scaringe Declaration)(Flack, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC, filed.(Flack, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sun Trust Bank identifying SunTrust Bank Holding Company as Corporate Parent, filed.(Smith, Karen)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Digital Federal Credit Union. (Travis, Emily)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand, filed by Sun Trust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Smith, Karen)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim, #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Dismiss - the submission date will be 21 days after the court rules on plaintiff's motion to remand. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER expediting response to #13 MOTION to Remand. Responses due by close of business 7/29/2019.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim, #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #10 MOTION to Dismiss #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (09) by Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order)(Flack, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Remand re: #13 MOTION to Remand, filed.(Flack, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Flack, Paul)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed.(Travis, Emily)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Superior Refining Company, LLC identifying Husky Superior Refining Holding Corp. and Husky Energy Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Allen, Margaret)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (09) by Superior Refining Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Allen, Margaret)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Service of Process, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim by Superior Refining Company, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Margaret)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Digital Federal Credit Union, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Travis, Emily)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Sun Trust Bank, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Proposed Order)(Smith, Karen)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 9/27/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H Miller. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (leddins, 4)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECUSAL ORDER. Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th District Court of Harris County, case number 2019-40760 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22738636) filed by Sun Trust Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit C-4, #7 Exhibit C-5, #8 Exhibit C-6, #9 Exhibit C-7, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC v. Sun Trust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evergreen Environmental Services, LLC
Represented By: Paul D Flack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Refining Company, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Hope Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Emily Lauren Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Trust Bank
Represented By: Karen Denise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?