UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 2014 Dodge Durango, VIN No. 1C4SDJCT8EC977899
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: 2014 Dodge Durango, VIN No. 1C4SDJCT8EC977899
Claimant: MS Yajaira Medina-Solorio
Case Number: 4:2019cv02494
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Yajaira Medina-Solorio, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit marriage certificate and vehicle title)(Baston, Valerie)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service Executed as to Epfanio Cabrera-Huato on 7/29/19 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives on July 25, 2019 re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem, filed.(Bauman, Stephanie)
July 17, 2019 Arrest WARRANT issued, filed.(olindor, 4)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Bauman, Stephanie)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Bauman, Stephanie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2014 Dodge Durango, VIN No. 1C4SDJCT8EC977899 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Bauman, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. 2014 Dodge Durango, VIN No. 1C4SDJCT8EC977899
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Dodge Durango, VIN No. 1C4SDJCT8EC977899
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephanie Coon Bauman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MS Yajaira Medina-Solorio
Represented By: Valerie Denise Baston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?