County of Duval v. CVS Health Corporation
Plaintiff: County of Duval
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, McKesson Corporation and Mallinckrodt PLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02504
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand re: #12 MOTION to Remand by County of Duval, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snapka, Kathryn)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by County of Duval, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Remanding to State Court)(Snapka, Kathryn)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health Corporation, filed.(Torian, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this case is STAYED and administratively closed pending transfer to the MDL Panel. Case terminated on July 26, 2019 (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by County of Duval, filed.(Snapka, Kathryn)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re: #6 MOTION to Stay Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Torian, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Final Ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Petition by McKesson Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smyser, Craig)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Smyser, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 229th Judicial District Court, case number DC-19-178 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22768579) filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Torian, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Duval v. CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Duval
Represented By: Armando G Barrera
Represented By: Kathryn Snapka
Represented By: Baldemar F Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?