Zamorano v. JLG Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Zamorano
Defendant: United Rentals (North America), Inc, JLG Industries, Inc. and United Rentals, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02520
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Abate.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Abate by JLG Industries, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order)(Rowley, Kyle)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fernando Zamorano, filed.(Henning, Nicole)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JLG Industries, Inc., filed.(Caflisch, Giorgio)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Rentals (North America), Inc, United Rentals, Inc., filed.(Krone, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United Rentals (North America), Inc, United Rentals, Inc., filed.(Pickett, Leslie)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT to Removal by United Rentals (North America), Inc, filed.(Pickett, Leslie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial District, case number 2019-39615 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22774197) filed by JLG Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet 12)(Rowley, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamorano v. JLG Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Zamorano
Represented By: Nicole Elizalde Henning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals (North America), Inc
Represented By: Leslie Dean Pickett
Represented By: Andrew S. Krone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle M Rowley
Represented By: Giorgio George Caflisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Dean Pickett
Represented By: Andrew S. Krone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?