Gunvor USA LLC et al v. Valero Marketing & Supply Company et al
Plaintiff: Gunvor SA and Gunvor USA LLC
Defendant: Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd., Torm A/S and TORM THUNDER, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Valero Marketing & Supply Company
3Rd Party Defendant: KM Liquids Terminals LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02522
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to KM Liquids Terminals LLC served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019, filed.(Letourneau, Keith)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Valero Marketing & Supply Company, filed.(Wyatte, Zachary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valero Marketing & Supply Company, filed.(Wyatte, Zachary)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary J. Wyatte on behalf of Valero Marketing & Supply Company, filed. (Wyatte, Zachary)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to KM Liquids Terminals LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(hlerma, 4)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against KM Liquids Terminals LLC, CROSSCLAIM against TORM THUNDER, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, Torm A/S, Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd. by Valero Marketing & Supply Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Letourneau, Keith)
July 24, 2019 ***Answer due 10/16/2019 for Torm A/S, and Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd. (bthomas, 4)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gunvor SA, Gunvor USA LLC, filed.(Walters, Kevin)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Torm A/S served on 7/18/2019, answer due 10/16/2019; Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 10/16/2019, filed.(Walters, Kevin) Modified on 7/24/2019 (bthomas, 4).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Valero Marketing & Supply Company, Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd., filed.(Walters, Kevin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Valero Marketing & Supply Company, Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Walters, Kevin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TORM THUNDER, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem, Torm A/S, Valero Marketing & Supply Company, Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22776988) filed by Gunvor USA LLC, Gunvor SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walters, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunvor USA LLC et al v. Valero Marketing & Supply Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vessel Co 8 Pte. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torm A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORM THUNDER, her engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunvor SA
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunvor USA LLC
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Valero Marketing & Supply Company
Represented By: Keith Bernard Letourneau
Represented By: Zachary J Wyatte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: KM Liquids Terminals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?