Escobar v. USA
Plaintiff: Fabiola Escobar
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 4:2019cv02527
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Fabiola Escobar, filed.(Inurria, Nathan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by USA, filed.(Hinrichs, Fred)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Resetting Conference. Initial Conference reset for 10/29/2019 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Fabiola Escobar.(Inurria, Nathan)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fabiola Escobar, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(hlerma, 4)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Inurria, Nathan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22779360) filed by Fabiola Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Inurria, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escobar v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Fred Turner Hinrichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Escobar
Represented By: Nathan Eugene Inurria
Represented By: George K Farah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?