Wilson et al v. Daniel et al
Plaintiff: Walt Wilson and Susan Wilson
Defendant: Wayne Richard Wente, Penguin Trucking, Inc. and Michael Cameron Daniel
Case Number: 4:2019cv02580
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Hill on behalf of Michael Cameron Daniel, filed. (Cancienne, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Hill on behalf of Michael Cameron Daniel, filed. (Cancienne, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to #12 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed by Susan Wilson, Walt Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Beckcom, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 First RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by Penguin Trucking, Inc., Wayne Richard Wente. (Volf, Christopher)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Michael Cameron Daniel, filed.(Cancienne, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Susan Wilson, Walt Wilson, filed.(Beckcom, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Cameron Daniel, filed.(Cancienne, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Penguin Trucking, Inc., Wayne Richard Wente, filed.(Volf, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Susan Wilson, Walt Wilson, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report, #2 Exhibit Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Beckcom, Brian)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Cameron Daniel. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 10/31/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Michael Cameron Daniel, filed.(Beckcom, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT of Removal by Penguin Trucking, Inc., filed.(Volf, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th Judicial Dist of Harris County, TX, case number 2019-40444 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22804247) filed by Wayne Richard Wente, Penguin Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Volf, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Daniel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walt Wilson
Represented By: Brian Augustus Beckcom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Wilson
Represented By: Brian Augustus Beckcom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Richard Wente
Represented By: Christopher Michael Volf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Volf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cameron Daniel
Represented By: Michael Andre Cancienne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?