Bunner v. Carmax Auto Superstores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ashtin Bunner
Defendant: Carmax Auto Superstores, Inc.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Edward Downs Fisher
Case Number: 4:2019cv02650
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Fisher on behalf of Edward Downs Fisher, filed. (Fisher, Edward)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Carmax Auto Superstores, Inc., filed.(Neff, Sabrina)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2018-49583 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22816429) filed by Carmax Auto Superstores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B-4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B-5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B-6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B-7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B-8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B-9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B-10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit B-11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit B-12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit B-13, #17 Exhibit Exhibit B-14, #18 Exhibit Exhibit B-15, #19 Exhibit Exhibit B-16, #20 Exhibit Exhibit B-17, #21 Exhibit Exhibit B-18, #22 Exhibit Exhibit B-19, #23 Exhibit Exhibit B-20, #24 Exhibit Exhibit B-21, #25 Exhibit Exhibit B-22, #26 Exhibit Exhibit B-23, #27 Exhibit Exhibit C, #28 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Neff, Sabrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunner v. Carmax Auto Superstores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmax Auto Superstores, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina Anne Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashtin Bunner
Represented By: Darrell M Minton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Edward Downs Fisher
Represented By: Edward Downs Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?