Phan VM Holding, LLC v. Evanston Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Phan VM Holding, LLC
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02656
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF REMAND- GRANTING #5 MOTION to Remand. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiffs #5 motion to remand is GRANTED. The case is REMANDED to the Harris County Civil Court at Law Number One. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Phan VM Holding, LLC, filed.(Dick, Eric)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evanston Insurance Company, filed.(Wood, Dolores)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wood, Dolores)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Phan VM Holding, LLC, filed.(Dick, Eric)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's motion to remand no later than close of business Friday, August 23, 2019.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Phan VM Holding, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Dick, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 9/6/2019(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT on Jurisdiction Pursuant to Court's Order of July 22, 2019 by Evanston Insurance Company, filed.(Wood, Dolores)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Civil Court at Law Number 1, Harris County, Texas, case number 1135312 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22817319) filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Dolores)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan VM Holding, LLC v. Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Dolores Christene Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phan VM Holding, LLC
Represented By: Eric B. Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?