Karachiwalla et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mustafa Yamani and Sabrina Karachiwalla
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02658
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED ANSWER to by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed. (Wolbert, Clinton)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Sabrina Karachiwalla, Mustafa Yamani, filed. (Landry, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Burke, Melinda)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Burke, Melinda)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 284th Montgomery County District Court, case number 19-06-08093 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22818471) filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Burke, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karachiwalla et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Melinda Ruth Burke
Represented By: Clinton James Wolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mustafa Yamani
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Karachiwalla
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?