Bonner et al v. Harris County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Raquethia Bonner, Christopher Bonner, Akia Laymond and Keneau Laymond
Defendant: Harris County, Texas, S. Harris, Individually and John and Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2019cv02675
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Jimenez on behalf of Harris County, Texas, filed. (Jimenez, Victoria)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge George C Hanks, Jr, pursuant to Special Order No. 2019-3. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect, and all court settings are vacated. Judge Keith P Ellison no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Insufficient Service of Process and For Failure To State A Claim, filed by Christopher Bonner, Raquethia Bonner, Akia Laymond, Keneau Laymond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Evans, Andre)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Insufficient Service of Process and For Failure To State A Claim by Harris County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toler, Keith)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Harris County, Texas, filed.(Toler, Keith)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-35046 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22827728) filed by Harris County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 List of Counsel, #3 Index of Matters Filed Upon Removal)(Toler, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner et al v. Harris County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquethia Bonner
Represented By: Andre D'Shawn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bonner
Represented By: Andre D'Shawn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akia Laymond
Represented By: Andre D'Shawn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keneau Laymond
Represented By: Andre D'Shawn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County, Texas
Represented By: Keith Adams Toler
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Harris, Individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?