Lindly v. Montgomery County et al
Plaintiff: Elmer Lindly
Defendant: Montgomery County, Sampson Clark, Sandra Kolapo, Jeremy Johnson, Jeremy Freeman, Lt. Richards, Lori Harden, Nikita Roundtree, Andrew Hilgers, Inspector Joshua Wright, Marquis Hines, Deputy Stover, Stephen Lewis, Health Secure Admin, Michael Rooney, Emilyanne Folkes, Tyler Hall, Conrad Rappleyea, Edith White-Stewart, Jennifer Victor, Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc., Sgt. James Dodson, Daniel Bell, Sgt. Christina Harper, Joshua Averitt, Correctional Healthcare Companies, Inc., Montgomery County, Texas, Joshua Wright, Wellpath Recovery Solutions, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Nikita Sherri Roundtree and Stover
Case Number: 4:2019cv02733
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc., filed.(Ryan, Timothy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Stephen Muller on behalf of Elmer Lindly, filed. (Muller, Matthew)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Montgomery County, Texas 11/22/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file an answer by Montgomery County, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Plake, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Nikita Sherri Roundtree. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nikita Sherri Roundtree, filed.(Kallinen, Randall)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Correctional Healthcare Companies, Inc., Wellpath Recovery Solutions. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
September 5, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to Nikita Sherri Roundtree due to these deficiencies: Typo in the party named on summons when compared to the Amended Complaint. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Elmer Lindly.(Kallinen, Randall)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Nikita Sherri Roundtree, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Correctional Healthcare Companies, Inc., Wellpath Recovery Solutions, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons, #2 Exhibit summons, #3 Exhibit summons)(Kallinen, Randall)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joshua Averitt, Daniel Bell, Sampson Clark, Sgt. James Dodson, Emilyanne Folkes, Jeremy Freeman, Tyler Hall, Lori Harden, Sgt. Christina Harper, Andrew Hilgers, Marquis Hines, Jeremy Johnson, Sandra Kolapo, Stephen Lewis, Conrad Rappleyea, Lt. Richards, Michael Rooney, Stover, Jennifer Victor, Edith White-Stewart, Joshua Wright. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Joshua Averitt, Daniel Bell, Sampson Clark, Sgt. James Dodson, Emilyanne Folkes, Jeremy Freeman, Tyler Hall, Lori Harden, Sgt. Christina Harper, Andrew Hilgers, Marquis Hines, Jeremy Johnson, Sandra Kolapo, Stephen Lewis, Conrad Rappleyea, Lt. Richards, Michael Rooney, Nikita Sherri Roundtree, Stover, Jennifer Victor, Edith White-Stewart, Joshua Wright, filed. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summons, #2 Additional Summons, #3 Additional Summons, #4 Additional Summons, #5 Additional Summons, #6 Additional Summons, #7 Additional Summons, #8 Additional Summons, #9 Additional Summons, #10 Additional Summons, #11 Additional Summons, #12 Additional Summons, #13 Additional Summons, #14 Additional Summons, #15 Additional Summons, #16 Additional Summons, #17 Additional Summons, #18 Additional Summons, #19 Additional Summons, #20 Additional Summons)(Kallinen, Randall)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Health Secure Admin, Montgomery County, Texas, Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(sanderson, 4)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Health Secure Admin, Montgomery County, Texas, Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summons, #2 Additional Summons)(Kallinen, Randall)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22850746) filed by Elmer Lindly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kallinen, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindly v. Montgomery County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sampson Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Kolapo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikita Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspector Joshua Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquis Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Secure Admin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilyanne Folkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conrad Rappleyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith White-Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Correctional Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy David Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. James Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Christina Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Averitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Healthcare Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Texas
Represented By: Daniel Plake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Recovery Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikita Sherri Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Lindly
Represented By: Randall Lee Kallinen
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?