Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 4:2019cv02748
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Cases by Malibu Media, LLC, filed. (Beik, Paul)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Beik, Paul)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 Register of Copyrights, AO-121, Notified. (LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malibu Media, LLC, filed.(Beik, Paul)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Malibu Media, LLC, filed.(Beik, Paul)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22857819) filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beik, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Paul Stephen Beik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?