Harris v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracey L Harris
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02762
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by United Airlines, Inc., filed.(Misra, Amit)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Airlines, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/16/2019. (Misra, Amit)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Airlines, Inc., filed.(Misra, Amit)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2019-21214 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22863636) filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Misra, Amit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Amit K Misra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey L Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?