AK Service, LLC v. Tide Aircraft, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AK Service, LLC
Defendant: Tide Aircraft, LLC, Claude Hendrickson, Dixie Turbine Services, LLC and International Turbine Services--Doswell, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02794
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dixie Turbine Services, LLC, Claude Hendrickson, International Turbine Services--Doswell, LLC, Tide Aircraft, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rcastro, 4)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Additional Summons, #2 Continuation Additional Summons, #3 Continuation Additional Summons)(Clote, Paul)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by McGinnis Lochridge LLP, counsel for AK Service, LLC, filed. (Clote, Paul)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22880692) filed by AK Service, LLC.(Clote, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AK Service, LLC v. Tide Aircraft, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AK Service, LLC
Represented By: Paul D Clote
Represented By: Veronica Diana Cruz
Represented By: Marcus V. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tide Aircraft, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Turbine Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Turbine Services--Doswell, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?