Cavazos v. American Wind Transport Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Delia Dennise Cavazos
Defendant: Edward A. Rubel and American Wind Transport Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02802
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Delia Dennise Cavazos, filed.(Villarreal, Javier)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Edward A. Rubel served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019, filed.(Villarreal, Javier)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Wind Transport Group, LLC, Edward A. Rubel, filed.(Holloway, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by American Wind Transport Group, LLC, Edward A. Rubel, filed.(Holloway, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to American Wind Transport Group, LLC served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019, filed.(Villarreal, Javier)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Wind Transport Group, LLC, Edward A. Rubel. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sanderson, 4)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Delia Dennise Cavazos, filed.(Villarreal, Javier)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(SarahShelbyadi, 4)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to American Wind Transport Group, LLC, Edward A. Rubel, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Villarreal, Javier)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22883899) filed by Delia Dennise Cavazos.(Villarreal, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavazos v. American Wind Transport Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Rubel
Represented By: Gregory Arthur Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Wind Transport Group, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Arthur Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Dennise Cavazos
Represented By: Javier Villarreal
Represented By: Miguel Daniel Trevino
Represented By: Daniel Alberto Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?