County of Jim Hogg v. CVS Health Corporation
Plaintiff: County of Jim Hogg
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Company CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Walgreen Co, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma LP, Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis LLC, Walmart Stores Inc, Purdue Frederick Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Amerisource Bergen Corporation, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd and Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02816
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Plf Jim Hogg's Emergency Motion to Sever Purdue by County of Jim Hogg, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email from atty for Purdue, #2 Exhibit Plf Jim Hogg Emergency Motion to Sever Purdue, #3 Exhibit Ex A to Plf's Emergency Motion, #4 Exhibit Ex B to Plf's Emergency Motion, #5 Exhibit Ex C to Plf's Emergency Motion, #6 Exhibit Ex D to Plf's Emergency Motion, #7 Exhibit Ex E to Plf's Emergency Motion, #8 Exhibit Ex F to Plf's Emergency Motion, #9 Exhibit Ex G to Plf's Emergency Motion, #10 Exhibit Ex H to Plf's Emergency Motion, #11 Exhibit Ex I to Plf's Emergency Motion, #12 Proposed Order Motion to Leave)(Snapka, Kathryn)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Stay and Denying #7 Motion to Remand..(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Supplemental MOTION Supplemental Notice of Removal by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Supplemental Notice of Removal)(Simon, Joel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/22/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand re: #7 MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Hogg, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Snapka, Kathryn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by County of Jim Hogg, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/10/2019. (Snapka, Kathryn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of re: #5 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Torian, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by CVS Health Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Torian, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/3/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11A before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Cases by CVS Health Corporation, filed. (Torian, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22893138) filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Torian, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Jim Hogg v. CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Mark E Torian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company CVS Pharmacy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Joel Cameron Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Jim Hogg
Represented By: Rodolfo Gutierrez
Represented By: Kathryn Snapka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?