Chavez v. Obenauer et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Chavez
Defendant: Dennis David Obenauer and William R. Weiss Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a TNT Sales
Case Number: 4:2019cv02860
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Elizabeth Chavez, filed.(Goff, Jason)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dennis David Obenauer, William R. Weiss Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a TNT Sales, filed.(Ramey, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Judge Keith P Ellison no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Keith P Ellison recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Judicial District, case number 2019-39718 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22902586) filed by William R. Weiss Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a TNT Sales, Dennis David Obenauer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Obenauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis David Obenauer
Represented By: Robert Langdon Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Weiss Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a TNT Sales
Represented By: Robert Langdon Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Chavez
Represented By: Jason D Goff
Represented By: Javier Marcos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?